Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4062 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17468 Week
» 70484 Month
» 190011 Year
» 3216864 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #29312
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
107 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A4 |
60003 |
ANDREW K McCOSH |
10/10/1951 |
A4 |
60018 |
SPARROWHAWK |
17/11/1954 |
A4 |
60010 |
DOMINION OF CANADA |
01/06/1956 |
A4 |
60008 |
DWIGHT D EISENHOWER |
20/08/1958 |
A4 |
60005 |
SIR CHARLES NEWTON |
14/07/1960 |
|