Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 791 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14197 Week
» 67213 Month
» 186740 Year
» 3213593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2427
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
20/06/1929 |
Castle |
5005 |
MANORBIER CASTLE |
27/12/1933 |
Castle |
5026 |
CRICCIETH CASTLE |
26/05/1938 |
Castle |
5040 |
STOKESAY CASTLE |
04/05/1939 |
Castle |
4078 |
PEMBROKE CASTLE |
17/08/1944 |
Castle |
5093 |
UPTON CASTLE |
23/08/1945 |
Castle |
7003 |
ELMLEY CASTLE |
04/05/1961 |
Castle |
7006 |
LYDFORD CASTLE |
19/03/1962 |
|