Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1208 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24839 Week
» 89793 Month
» 292457 Year
» 3319310 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2422
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
10/07/1930 |
Castle |
4000 |
NORTH STAR |
14/06/1934 |
Castle |
5014 |
GOODRICH CASTLE |
05/07/1935 |
Castle |
5054 |
EARL OF DUCIE |
30/09/1939 |
Castle |
5049 |
EARL OF PLYMOUTH |
23/06/1944 |
Castle |
5001 |
LLANDOVERY CASTLE |
13/07/1944 |
Castle |
5040 |
STOKESAY CASTLE |
09/06/1945 |
Castle |
4099 |
KILGERRAN CASTLE |
08/02/1954 |
|