Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 551 Today
» 1100 Yesterday
» 5807 Week
» 24390 Month
» 221907 Year
» 298494 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2654
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5000 LAUNCESTON CASTLE 07/04/1934
Castle 5000 LAUNCESTON CASTLE 07/12/1934
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 31/03/1936
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 28/09/1943
Castle 5080 DEFIANT 22/04/1944
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 15/06/1944
Castle 5025 CHIRK CASTLE 30/05/1946
Castle 5025 CHIRK CASTLE 10/03/1950
Castle 4097 KENILWORTH CASTLE 02/10/1951
Castle 4093 DUNSTER CASTLE 03/04/1952