Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1059 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18862 Week
» 71878 Month
» 191405 Year
» 3218258 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4001
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
17/10/1946 |
Castle |
5016 |
MONTGOMERY CASTLE |
22/11/1946 |
Castle |
7014 |
CAERHAYS CASTLE |
16/07/1948 |
Castle |
5067 |
ST FAGANS CASTLE |
05/06/1950 |
Castle |
7012 |
BARRY CASTLE |
27/04/1951 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
28/01/1952 |
Castle |
5016 |
MONTGOMERY CASTLE |
11/10/1954 |
Castle |
5035 |
COITY CASTLE |
26/03/1955 |
Castle |
7017 |
G. J. CHURCHWARD |
23/04/1955 |
Castle |
5059 |
EARL ST ALDWYN |
27/03/1956 |
Castle |
7030 |
CRANBROOK CASTLE |
11/05/1961 |
|