Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1176 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 2407 Week
» 14112 Month
» 345601 Year
» 422188 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4005
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 09/02/1948
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 09/09/1949
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 28/01/1950
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 30/01/1951
Castle 5010 RESTORMEL CASTLE 25/01/1952
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 07/04/1953
Castle 4098 KIDWELLY CASTLE 15/03/1957
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 17/12/1958
Castle 5043 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE 01/1962
Castle 4093 DUNSTER CASTLE 09/03/1962