Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 334 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 334 Week
» 7139 Month
» 114085 Year
» 1335650 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2588
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 09/03/1933
Castle 5049 EARL OF PLYMOUTH 26/09/1947
Castle 5085 EVESHAM ABBEY 25/11/1948
Castle 5000 LAUNCESTON CASTLE 03/12/1949
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 29/12/1949
Castle 5090 NEATH ABBEY 24/04/1957
Castle 5098 CLIFFORD CASTLE 30/01/1959
Castle 5032 USK CASTLE 24/02/1961