Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 148 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 1223 Week
» 22125 Month
» 22125 Year
» 1243690 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2597
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 31/10/1936
Star 4066 VISCOUNT HORNE 13/12/1937
Castle 5019 TREAGO CASTLE 12/06/1940
Castle 5086 VISCOUNT HORNE 30/07/1942
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 03/07/1943
Castle 5025 CHIRK CASTLE 27/10/1944
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 28/05/1946
Castle 5000 LAUNCESTON CASTLE 06/01/1950
Castle 5040 STOKESAY CASTLE 27/02/1952
Castle 5071 SPITFIRE 28/03/1956
Castle 5034 CORFE CASTLE 02/06/1958
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 09/08/1958