Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2742 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16148 Week
» 69164 Month
» 188691 Year
» 3215544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2421
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5011 |
TINTAGEL CASTLE |
04/04/1929 |
Castle |
4098 |
KIDWELLY CASTLE |
09/04/1931 |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
27/05/1932 |
Castle |
5015 |
KINGSWEAR CASTLE |
07/07/1933 |
Castle |
5015 |
KINGSWEAR CASTLE |
20/06/1940 |
Castle |
5071 |
SPITFIRE |
09/05/1942 |
Castle |
5086 |
VISCOUNT HORNE |
29/04/1944 |
Castle |
5074 |
HAMPDEN |
25/08/1944 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
26/11/1946 |
Castle |
5025 |
CHIRK CASTLE |
30/04/1948 |
Castle |
5073 |
BLENHEIM |
21/03/1950 |
Castle |
4080 |
POWDERHAM CASTLE |
02/06/1950 |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
29/08/1951 |
Castle |
5033 |
BROUGHTON CASTLE |
21/05/1952 |
Castle |
5075 |
WELLINGTON |
30/09/1952 |
Castle |
5075 |
WELLINGTON |
18/04/1953 |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
23/09/1953 |
Castle |
7010 |
AVONDALE CASTLE |
06/04/1954 |
|