Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 284 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 284 Week
» 7089 Month
» 114035 Year
» 1335600 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2634
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5033 BROUGHTON CASTLE 08/05/1937
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 06/01/1942
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 17/04/1942
Castle 5086 VISCOUNT HORNE 06/07/1943
Castle 5056 EARL OF POWIS 19/04/1944
Castle 5095 BARBURY CASTLE 11/12/1945
Castle 5000 LAUNCESTON CASTLE 18/06/1957
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 25/05/1962