Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 32 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17835 Week
» 70851 Month
» 190378 Year
» 3217231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2696
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5057 |
PENRICE CASTLE |
26/06/1936 |
Castle |
5004 |
LLANSTEPHAN CASTLE |
02/06/1938 |
Castle |
5004 |
LLANSTEPHAN CASTLE |
29/04/1946 |
Castle |
4077 |
CHEPSTOW CASTLE |
19/03/1957 |
Castle |
4087 |
CARDIGAN CASTLE |
02/11/1957 |
Castle |
5000 |
LAUNCESTON CASTLE |
10/01/1958 |
Castle |
4087 |
CARDIGAN CASTLE |
13/08/1959 |
|