Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 647 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 7208 Week
» 28110 Month
» 28110 Year
» 1249675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4049
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 09/11/1948
Castle 7006 LYDFORD CASTLE 28/05/1951
Castle 5032 USK CASTLE 27/05/1952
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 21/08/1957
Castle 5000 LAUNCESTON CASTLE 07/08/1959