Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 451 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1790 Week
» 31288 Month
» 368134 Year
» 1589699 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2415
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 02/04/1929
Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE 07/12/1931
Castle 5018 ST MAWES CASTLE 11/12/1936
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 11/08/1937
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 16/06/1939
Castle 5016 MONTGOMERY CASTLE 26/02/1940
Castle 4088 DARTMOUTH CASTLE 10/06/1941
Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE 17/04/1943
Castle 5061 EARL OF BIRKENHEAD 27/04/1945
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 30/10/1947