Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 424 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1763 Week
» 31261 Month
» 368107 Year
» 1589672 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2615
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE 07/09/1932
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 01/09/1936
Castle 4032 QUEEN ALEXANDRA 14/01/1938
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 05/04/1939
Castle 5094 TRETOWER CASTLE 21/08/1941
Castle 4094 DYNEVOR CASTLE 06/04/1943
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 17/12/1945
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 13/01/1947
Castle 5072 HURRICANE 21/02/1948