Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1070 Today
» 1145 Yesterday
» 7116 Week
» 26761 Month
» 61403 Year
» 1282968 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2400
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE 02/04/1935
Castle 4000 NORTH STAR 11/09/1942
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 02/12/1943
Castle 5037 MONMOUTH CASTLE 19/04/1946
Castle 4077 CHEPSTOW CASTLE 30/07/1946
Castle 7004 EASTNOR CASTLE 30/09/1948
Castle 7007 GREAT WESTERN 30/01/1952
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 11/03/1952
Castle 5039 RHUDDLAN CASTLE 24/05/1957