Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 524 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1863 Week
» 31361 Month
» 368207 Year
» 1589772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2656
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 12/12/1934
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 06/05/1937
Castle 4090 DORCHESTER CASTLE 17/06/1937
Castle 5049 EARL OF PLYMOUTH 05/07/1938
Castle 4073 CAERPHILLY CASTLE 01/08/1939
Castle 5067 ST FAGANS CASTLE 17/07/1941
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 30/01/1943
Castle 5021 WHITTINGTON CASTLE 16/06/1943
Castle 5079 LYSANDER 01/09/1945
Castle 5060 EARL OF BERKELEY 23/01/1947
Castle 5043 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE 21/06/1949
Castle 4097 KENILWORTH CASTLE 13/08/1953
Castle 5054 EARL OF DUCIE 15/02/1955
Castle 5013 ABERGAVENNY CASTLE 01/02/1957