Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1347 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19150 Week
» 72166 Month
» 191693 Year
» 3218546 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2710
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Star |
4064 |
READING ABBEY |
04/1937 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
03/11/1956 |
Castle |
4073 |
CAERPHILLY CASTLE |
23/01/1957 |
Castle |
5013 |
ABERGAVENNY CASTLE |
03/11/1958 |
Castle |
7026 |
TENBY CASTLE |
03/10/1960 |
Castle |
7025 |
SUDELEY CASTLE |
28/05/1963 |
|