Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 881 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18684 Week
» 71700 Month
» 191227 Year
» 3218080 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2405
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4074 |
CALDICOT CASTLE |
11/02/1929 |
Castle |
4078 |
PEMBROKE CASTLE |
28/02/1930 |
Castle |
5015 |
KINGSWEAR CASTLE |
17/10/1936 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
04/12/1936 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
28/01/1942 |
Castle |
5070 |
SIR DANIEL GOOCH |
24/06/1942 |
Castle |
5057 |
EARL WALDEGRAVE |
13/11/1942 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
21/09/1944 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
11/04/1945 |
|