Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 430 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1769 Week
» 31267 Month
» 368113 Year
» 1589678 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2411
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 09/03/1929
Castle 4092 DUNRAVEN CASTLE 11/04/1930
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 11/04/1931
Castle 5008 RAGLAN CASTLE 22/10/1932
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 21/06/1933
Castle 4009 SHOOTING STAR 20/04/1934
Castle 4074 CALDICOT CASTLE 14/01/1936
Castle 5049 EARL OF PLYMOUTH 13/06/1941
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 26/03/1942
Castle 5036 LYONSHALL CASTLE 12/09/1942
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 22/08/1943
Castle 5095 BARBURY CASTLE 28/10/1943
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 04/06/1945
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 03/07/1945
Castle 5035 COITY CASTLE 26/06/1946
Castle 5019 TREAGO CASTLE 24/02/1948
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 02/08/1951
Castle 7012 BARRY CASTLE 31/01/1952
Castle 7009 ATHELNEY CASTLE 19/03/1956
Castle 5088 LLANTHONY ABBEY 27/06/1960