Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2426
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4095 HARLECH CASTLE 17/04/1929
Castle 5011 TINTAGEL CASTLE 01/07/1930
Castle 4097 KENILWORTH CASTLE 05/1931
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 30/11/1931
Castle 5017 ST DONAT'S CASTLE 22/11/1933
Castle 4074 CALDICOT CASTLE 25/08/1937
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 19/04/1938
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 01/11/1939
Castle 5049 EARL OF PLYMOUTH 12/02/1941
Castle 5048 EARL OF DEVON 18/04/1941
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 11/10/1941
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 06/05/1942
Castle 5042 WINCHESTER CASTLE 05/11/1960