Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 418 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1757 Week
» 31255 Month
» 368101 Year
» 1589666 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2711
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4074 CALDICOT CASTLE 09/12/1938
Castle 4093 DUNSTER CASTLE 14/01/1941
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 09/07/1949
Castle 5041 TIVERTON CASTLE 17/02/1950
Castle 5044 EARL OF DUNRAVEN 17/02/1950
Castle 5048 EARL OF DEVON 10/01/1957
Castle 7025 SUDELEY CASTLE 20/10/1959