Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3807 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17213 Week
» 70229 Month
» 189756 Year
» 3216609 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2852
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4074 |
CALDICOT CASTLE |
16/02/1949 |
Castle |
4078 |
PEMBROKE CASTLE |
04/12/1950 |
Castle |
5055 |
EARL OF ELDON |
18/09/1952 |
Castle |
5074 |
HAMPDEN |
02/07/1954 |
Castle |
5088 |
LLANTHONY ABBEY |
21/06/1956 |
Castle |
5059 |
EARL ST ALDWYN |
02/04/1958 |
Castle |
5094 |
TRETOWER CASTLE |
16/04/1958 |
|