Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 206 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 6918 Week
» 20022 Month
» 20022 Year
» 1241587 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4007
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 12/12/1946
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 11/01/1949
Castle 5040 STOKESAY CASTLE 19/09/1950
Castle 4074 CALDICOT CASTLE 15/02/1952
Castle 5029 NUNNEY CASTLE 25/07/1952
Castle 5059 EARL ST ALDWYN 14/08/1952
Castle 5098 CLIFFORD CASTLE 15/04/1954
Castle 7036 TAUNTON CASTLE 23/11/1955
Castle 5008 RAGLAN CASTLE 16/01/1956
Castle 5036 LYONSHALL CASTLE 23/03/1957
Castle 5043 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE 03/03/1960