Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 131 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 131 Week
» 18253 Month
» 187025 Year
» 1071406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2736
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5024 CAREW CASTLE 14/07/1944
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 14/06/1949
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 06/09/1950
Castle 5071 SPITFIRE 03/10/1951
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 12/07/1952
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 04/03/1953
Castle 7007 GREAT WESTERN 24/12/1953
Castle 4074 CALDICOT CASTLE 12/05/1954
Castle 5026 CRICCIETH CASTLE 29/04/1955
Castle 5082 SWORDFISH 07/1957