Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 1183 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 3839 Week
» 32419 Month
» 32419 Year
» 1253984 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2835
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5048 EARL OF DEVON 19/04/1944
Castle 4092 DUNRAVEN CASTLE 06/05/1954
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 16/03/1955
Castle 4074 CALDICOT CASTLE 15/02/1956
Castle 4074 CALDICOT CASTLE 02/12/1957