Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 321 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18124 Week
» 71140 Month
» 190667 Year
» 3217520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2534
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4094 |
DYNEVOR CASTLE |
29/06/1932 |
Castle |
5018 |
ST MAWES CASTLE |
25/11/1933 |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
11/04/1934 |
Castle |
5018 |
ST MAWES CASTLE |
20/10/1934 |
Castle |
5029 |
NUNNEY CASTLE |
11/03/1936 |
Castle |
5017 |
ST DONAT'S CASTLE |
10/06/1940 |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
15/09/1941 |
|