Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 643 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 7204 Week
» 28106 Month
» 28106 Year
» 1249671 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2449
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4098 KIDWELLY CASTLE 26/11/1929
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 26/03/1931
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 22/02/1933
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 22/02/1933
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 24/11/1933
Castle 4075 CARDIFF CASTLE 07/11/1938
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 02/05/1940
Castle 5027 FARLEIGH CASTLE 15/10/1940
Castle 5013 ABERGAVENNY CASTLE 15/09/1944
Castle 5031 TOTNES CASTLE 15/05/1947
Castle 4092 DUNRAVEN CASTLE 15/12/1948
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 08/1963