Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 793 Today
» 975 Yesterday
» 793 Week
» 22501 Month
» 285478 Year
» 362065 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2693
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4095 HARLECH CASTLE 18/03/1938
Castle 5028 LLANTILIO CASTLE 10/02/1941
Castle 4075 CARDIFF CASTLE 17/01/1942
Castle 5089 WESTMINSTER ABBEY 14/04/1949
Castle 5057 EARL WALDEGRAVE 09/09/1952
Castle 5016 MONTGOMERY CASTLE 04/11/1953
Castle 4093 DUNSTER CASTLE 01/10/1954
Castle 5095 BARBURY CASTLE 22/02/1956
Castle 7013 BRISTOL CASTLE 06/10/1956