Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2614
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5029 |
NUNNEY CASTLE |
10/01/1935 |
Castle |
5029 |
NUNNEY CASTLE |
17/06/1937 |
Castle |
4000 |
NORTH STAR |
27/04/1939 |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
09/12/1943 |
|