Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 468 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18271 Week
» 71287 Month
» 190814 Year
» 3217667 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2410
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4032 |
QUEEN ALEXANDRA |
11/1928 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
23/06/1930 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
22/08/1931 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
22/08/1931 |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
03/04/1933 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
24/04/1933 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
24/04/1933 |
Castle |
5041 |
TIVERTON CASTLE |
30/04/1937 |
Castle |
5044 |
BEVERSTON CASTLE |
30/04/1937 |
Castle |
4083 |
ABBOTSBURY CASTLE |
06/09/1941 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
04/02/1944 |
Castle |
5005 |
MANORBIER CASTLE |
17/10/1944 |
Castle |
4090 |
DORCHESTER CASTLE |
25/11/1947 |
Castle |
5054 |
EARL OF DUCIE |
30/07/1948 |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
04/03/1949 |
Castle |
5076 |
GLADIATOR |
29/11/1951 |
Castle |
4084 |
ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE |
04/1952 |
|