Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 324 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7129 Month
» 114075 Year
» 1335640 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2924
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 20/02/1946
Castle 4075 CARDIFF CASTLE 26/02/1953
Castle 7004 EASTNOR CASTLE 14/04/1954
Castle 5085 EVESHAM ABBEY 10/05/1961