Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1113 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8567 Week
» 11149 Month
» 275782 Year
» 1497347 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4115
Type Hawksworth 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 47t 6cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7026 TENBY CASTLE 18/02/1954
Castle 7031 CROMWELL'S CASTLE 27/04/1955
Castle 7006 LYDFORD CASTLE 13/08/1955
Castle 4075 CARDIFF CASTLE 23/03/1957
Castle 5008 RAGLAN CASTLE 27/03/1961