Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 289 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 16041 Month
» 104233 Year
» 988614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2632
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 08/10/1936
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 02/03/1938
Castle 5077 FAIREY BATTLE 25/10/1940
Castle 5018 ST MAWES CASTLE 16/09/1944
Castle 4083 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE 22/12/1944
Castle 5002 LUDLOW CASTLE 12/03/1945
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 20/05/1948
Castle 4075 CARDIFF CASTLE 26/12/1959
Castle 7012 BARRY CASTLE 19/10/1960