Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 204 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18007 Week
» 71023 Month
» 190550 Year
» 3217403 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2593
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4032 |
QUEEN ALEXANDRA |
11/03/1932 |
Castle |
4032 |
QUEEN ALEXANDRA |
04/07/1933 |
Castle |
5006 |
TREGENNA CASTLE |
28/10/1940 |
Castle |
5088 |
LLANTHONY ABBEY |
05/03/1942 |
Castle |
4077 |
CHEPSTOW CASTLE |
11/09/1943 |
Castle |
5033 |
BROUGHTON CASTLE |
14/06/1952 |
Castle |
5075 |
WELLINGTON |
03/03/1953 |
Castle |
7009 |
ATHELNEY CASTLE |
04/11/1953 |
Castle |
5061 |
EARL OF BIRKENHEAD |
23/06/1954 |
Castle |
5074 |
HAMPDEN |
05/07/1956 |
Castle |
5011 |
TINTAGEL CASTLE |
12/11/1956 |
Castle |
5069 |
ISAMBARD KINGDOM BRUNEL |
03/10/1959 |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
06/1961 |
Castle |
7032 |
DENBIGH CASTLE |
30/12/1961 |
|