Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1517 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19320 Week
» 72336 Month
» 191863 Year
» 3218716 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2438
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
17/08/1929 |
Castle |
4097 |
KENILWORTH CASTLE |
17/12/1930 |
Castle |
5010 |
RESTORMEL CASTLE |
03/06/1931 |
Castle |
4087 |
CARDIGAN CASTLE |
29/01/1932 |
Castle |
5009 |
SHREWSBURY CASTLE |
01/07/1932 |
Castle |
5009 |
SHREWSBURY CASTLE |
25/10/1933 |
Castle |
4093 |
DUNSTER CASTLE |
21/12/1934 |
Castle |
5062 |
EARL OF SHAFTESBURY |
25/10/1943 |
Castle |
4090 |
DORCHESTER CASTLE |
14/07/1945 |
Castle |
4000 |
NORTH STAR |
09/01/1946 |
Castle |
5008 |
RAGLAN CASTLE |
28/06/1957 |
|