Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 114 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1039 Week
» 18375 Month
» 296171 Year
» 1180552 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2444
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 12/11/1929
Castle 4076 CARMARTHEN CASTLE 26/08/1935
Castle 5042 WINCHESTER CASTLE 21/05/1936
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 07/08/1942
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 21/08/1942
Castle 5009 SHREWSBURY CASTLE 09/04/1948