Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 372 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 372 Week
» 7177 Month
» 114123 Year
» 1335688 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2566
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4097 KENILWORTH CASTLE 11/07/1934
Castle 5015 KINGSWEAR CASTLE 13/12/1935
Castle 4076 CARMARTHEN CASTLE 16/05/1936
Castle 5067 ST FAGANS CASTLE 16/03/1943
Castle 5089 WESTMINSTER ABBEY 17/01/1945
Castle 5093 UPTON CASTLE 29/09/1945
Castle 5065 NEWPORT CASTLE 09/04/1947
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 12/02/1948
Castle 5045 EARL OF DUDLEY 12/06/1948
Castle 4087 CARDIGAN CASTLE 22/12/1948
Castle 4090 DORCHESTER CASTLE 23/04/1949
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 14/03/1952
Castle 5063 EARL BALDWIN 14/01/1953
Castle 4037 THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS 22/06/1953