Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 129 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 129 Week
» 18251 Month
» 187023 Year
» 1071404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2636
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5033 BROUGHTON CASTLE 15/05/1936
Castle 4085 BERKELEY CASTLE 30/04/1937
Castle 5052 EARL OF RADNOR 10/08/1939
Castle 4082 WINDSOR CASTLE 27/11/1940
Castle 5086 VISCOUNT HORNE 31/05/1941
Castle 4076 CARMARTHEN CASTLE 18/07/1942
Castle 5042 WINCHESTER CASTLE 04/05/1944
Castle 5091 CLEEVE ABBEY 05/11/1948
Castle 5038 MORLAIS CASTLE 19/01/1954
Castle 7010 AVONDALE CASTLE 09/10/1954
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 19/11/1954
Castle 4099 KILGERRAN CASTLE 15/10/1957
Castle 5033 BROUGHTON CASTLE 21/05/1960
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 08/10/1960