Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 661 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14704 Week
» 79658 Month
» 282322 Year
» 3309175 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2616
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5067 |
ST FAGANS CASTLE |
11/05/1939 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
16/05/1944 |
Castle |
111 |
VISCOUNT CHURCHILL |
08/05/1946 |
Castle |
4086 |
BUILTH CASTLE |
10/06/1947 |
|