Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 634 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19545 Week
» 84499 Month
» 287163 Year
» 3314016 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4120
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
30/11/1950 |
Castle |
7021 |
HAVERFORDWEST CASTLE |
01/09/1952 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
29/07/1953 |
Castle |
5021 |
WHITTINGTON CASTLE |
17/12/1958 |
Castle |
7005 |
SIR EDWARD ELGAR |
10/08/1960 |
|