Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 267 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 267 Week
» 7072 Month
» 114018 Year
» 1335583 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2841
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5010 RESTORMEL CASTLE 18/01/1947
Castle 5093 UPTON CASTLE 13/08/1949
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 21/11/1950
Castle 5078 BEAUFORT 22/05/1953
Castle 7019 FOWEY CASTLE 26/02/1954
Castle 4086 BUILTH CASTLE 25/10/1954
Castle 5035 COITY CASTLE 20/01/1955
Castle 5055 EARL OF ELDON 26/03/1955
Castle 4076 CARMARTHEN CASTLE 23/10/1959
Castle 7002 DEVIZES CASTLE 10/07/1961