Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3955 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22866 Week
» 87820 Month
» 290484 Year
» 3317337 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2780
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5078 |
LAMPHEY CASTLE |
04/05/1939 |
Castle |
4095 |
HARLECH CASTLE |
12/09/1941 |
Castle |
5008 |
RAGLAN CASTLE |
16/07/1949 |
Castle |
5029 |
NUNNEY CASTLE |
11/09/1951 |
Castle |
5019 |
TREAGO CASTLE |
08/05/1958 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
15/08/1961 |
|