Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 497 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1836 Week
» 31334 Month
» 368180 Year
» 1589745 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2544
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4077 CHEPSTOW CASTLE 14/11/1930
Castle 4016 THE SOMERSET LIGHT INFANTRY (PRINCE ALBERT'S) 22/12/1943
Castle 5013 ABERGAVENNY CASTLE 12/06/1946
Castle 4037 THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS 04/10/1950
Castle 5005 MANORBIER CASTLE 13/02/1951
Castle 5030 SHIRBURN CASTLE 26/04/1951
Castle 7023 PENRICE CASTLE 11/09/1952
Castle 5099 COMPTON CASTLE 12/11/1952
Castle 5001 LLANDOVERY CASTLE 26/05/1953
Castle 5037 MONMOUTH CASTLE 15/12/1953