Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 75 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 2309 Week
» 23211 Month
» 23211 Year
» 1244776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2622
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 28/01/1937
Castle 5047 EARL OF DARTMOUTH 13/04/1938
Castle 4077 CHEPSTOW CASTLE 10/01/1940
Castle 5070 SIR DANIEL GOOCH 02/08/1946
Castle 5099 COMPTON CASTLE 12/09/1949
Castle 5080 DEFIANT 15/07/1950
Castle 4000 NORTH STAR 05/01/1955
Castle 4088 DARTMOUTH CASTLE 11/01/1957
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 30/04/1958
Castle 7010 AVONDALE CASTLE 18/01/1959