Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 339 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5976 Week
» 19080 Month
» 19080 Year
» 1240645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #4015
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 7003 ELMLEY CASTLE 13/06/1946
Castle 5086 VISCOUNT HORNE 11/04/1949
Castle 4077 CHEPSTOW CASTLE 16/05/1952
Castle 7036 TAUNTON CASTLE 27/12/1952
Castle 5087 TINTERN ABBEY 30/00/1954
Castle 7032 DENBIGH CASTLE 07/11/1958