Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 578 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18381 Week
» 71397 Month
» 190924 Year
» 3217777 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2729
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5065 |
UPTON CASTLE |
02/07/1937 |
Star |
5085 |
EVESHAM ABBEY |
07/1939 |
Castle |
4093 |
DUNSTER CASTLE |
06/12/1948 |
Castle |
4096 |
HIGHCLERE CASTLE |
25/02/1950 |
Castle |
5017 |
ST DONAT'S CASTLE |
29/01/1952 |
Castle |
4077 |
CHEPSTOW CASTLE |
02/01/1953 |
Castle |
5065 |
NEWPORT CASTLE |
04/12/1953 |
Castle |
5001 |
LLANDOVERY CASTLE |
05/10/1955 |
Castle |
5015 |
KINGSWEAR CASTLE |
15/08/1956 |
|