Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 646 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19557 Week
» 84511 Month
» 287175 Year
» 3314028 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2869
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4094 |
DYNEVOR CASTLE |
19/01/1942 |
Castle |
4097 |
KENILWORTH CASTLE |
18/09/1942 |
Castle |
5092 |
TRESCO ABBEY |
01/05/1945 |
Castle |
4032 |
QUEEN ALEXANDRA |
15/06/1948 |
Castle |
5009 |
SHREWSBURY CASTLE |
17/04/1951 |
Castle |
7014 |
CAERHAYS CASTLE |
20/03/1952 |
Castle |
7011 |
BANBURY CASTLE |
07/1953 |
Castle |
4098 |
KIDWELLY CASTLE |
02/02/1955 |
Castle |
4077 |
CHEPSTOW CASTLE |
02/11/1957 |
Castle |
7036 |
TAUNTON CASTLE |
15/06/1961 |
Castle |
7018 |
DRYSLLWYN CASTLE |
06/10/1962 |
|