Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1216 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 8670 Week
» 11252 Month
» 275885 Year
» 1497450 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2419
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 4096 HIGHCLERE CASTLE 09/03/1929
Castle 4084 ABERYSTWYTH CASTLE 23/10/1930
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 10/05/1934
Castle 5024 CAREW CASTLE 21/03/1938
Castle 5025 CHIRK CASTLE 28/01/1939
Castle 5083 BATH ABBEY 01/07/1953
Castle 7031 CROMWELL'S CASTLE 08/10/1955
Castle 4091 DUDLEY CASTLE 29/05/1956