Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 490 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 1829 Week
» 31327 Month
» 368173 Year
» 1589738 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2606
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5012 BERRY POMEROY CASTLE 09/07/1935
Castle 100A1 LLOYD'S 26/10/1936
Castle 4016 KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE 30/06/1937
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 03/02/1938
Castle 4090 DORCHESTER CASTLE 12/04/1955