Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Tender #2645
Type Collett 4,000g
Company GWR
Water 4,000gal
Coal 6t 0cwt
Weight Laden 46t 14cwt
Tender History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Castle 5006 TREGENNA CASTLE 02/06/1934
Castle 5016 MONTGOMERY CASTLE 14/01/1937
Castle 5050 EARL OF ST GERMANS 02/04/1938
Castle 5083 BATH ABBEY 14/06/1939
Castle 5058 EARL OF CLANCARTY 06/07/1939
Castle 4078 PEMBROKE CASTLE 04/04/1941
Castle 5003 LULWORTH CASTLE 06/08/1947
Castle 5084 READING ABBEY 30/05/1949
Castle 4089 DONNINGTON CASTLE 15/11/1950
Castle 5080 DEFIANT 05/07/1951